Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH07104922B | Global Dossier | 13.11.1995 | B2 | JPH05225297 | 03.09.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | US53319890 | 04.06.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0460420 | Global Dossier | 21.01.1998 | B1 | EP0460420 | 24.02.1993 | A3 | EP0460420 | 11.12.1991 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US53319890 | 04.06.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9102192 | 07.01.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | US53319890 | 04.06.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2042873 | 02.01.1996 | C | CA2042873 | 05.12.1991 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US53319890 | 04.06.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1029265C | 05.07.1995 | C | CN1057121 | 18.12.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | US53319890 | 04.06.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69128743D1 | 26.02.1998 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US53319890 | 04.06.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR960014180B | 14.10.1996 | B1 | KR920001367 | 30.01.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | US53319890 | 04.06.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5379376 | 03.01.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | US53319890 | 04.06.1990 |