EP0460420 - Bi-directional graphics attribute conversion profile [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.11.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/50] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bednowitz, Allan Lloyd 7 Pine View Road Mount Kisco, New York 10549 / US | [1991/50] | Representative(s) | Rach, Werner, et al IBM Deutschland Management & Business Support GmbH Patentwesen u. Urheberrecht 71137 Ehningen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/36] | Rach, Werner, Dr., et al IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH, Patentwesen und Urheberrecht 70548 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1991/50] | Schäfer, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH Patentwesen und Urheberrecht D-70548 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 91107465.6 | 08.05.1991 | [1991/50] | Priority number, date | US19900533198 | 04.06.1990 Original published format: US 533198 | [1991/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0460420 | Date: | 11.12.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0460420 | Date: | 24.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0460420 | Date: | 21.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G06T1/00 | [1998/04] | CPC: |
G06T17/00 (EP,US);
G06F17/00 (KR)
|
Former IPC [1991/50] | G06F15/72 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1991/50] | Title | German: | Zweiweg graphisches Attributumwandlungsprofil | [1998/04] | English: | Bi-directional graphics attribute conversion profile | [1991/50] | French: | Profile de conversion d'attribut graphique bi-directionnel | [1998/04] |
Former [1991/50] | Zweidimensionales graphisches Attributumwandlungsprofil | ||
Former [1991/50] | Profile de conversion d'attribut graphique bi-dimensionnel | Examination procedure | 19.12.1991 | Examination requested [1992/09] | 02.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.07.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.10.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 21.01.1998 | CH | 21.01.1998 | ES | 21.01.1998 | FR | 21.01.1998 | IT | 21.01.1998 | LI | 21.01.1998 | NL | 21.01.1998 | SE | 21.04.1998 | DE | 22.04.1998 | GB | 08.05.1998 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/07] | BE | 21.01.1998 | |
CH | 21.01.1998 | ||
ES | 21.01.1998 | ||
IT | 21.01.1998 | ||
LI | 21.01.1998 | ||
NL | 21.01.1998 | ||
SE | 21.04.1998 | ||
DE | 22.04.1998 | ||
GB | 08.05.1998 | ||
FR | 19.06.1998 | ||
Former [2002/25] | BE | 21.01.1998 | |
CH | 21.01.1998 | ||
ES | 21.01.1998 | ||
IT | 21.01.1998 | ||
LI | 21.01.1998 | ||
SE | 21.04.1998 | ||
DE | 22.04.1998 | ||
GB | 08.05.1998 | ||
FR | 19.06.1998 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 21.01.1998 | |
CH | 21.01.1998 | ||
IT | 21.01.1998 | ||
LI | 21.01.1998 | ||
SE | 21.04.1998 | ||
DE | 22.04.1998 | ||
GB | 08.05.1998 | ||
FR | 19.06.1998 | ||
Former [1999/25] | BE | 21.01.1998 | |
CH | 21.01.1998 | ||
LI | 21.01.1998 | ||
SE | 21.04.1998 | ||
DE | 22.04.1998 | ||
GB | 08.05.1998 | ||
FR | 19.06.1998 | ||
Former [1998/49] | BE | 21.01.1998 | |
CH | 21.01.1998 | ||
LI | 21.01.1998 | ||
SE | 21.04.1998 | ||
DE | 22.04.1998 | ||
FR | 19.06.1998 | ||
Former [1998/44] | CH | 21.01.1998 | |
LI | 21.01.1998 | ||
SE | 21.04.1998 | ||
DE | 22.04.1998 | ||
FR | 19.06.1998 | ||
Former [1998/43] | CH | 21.01.1998 | |
LI | 21.01.1998 | ||
SE | 21.04.1998 | ||
DE | 22.04.1998 | ||
Former [1998/41] | DE | 22.04.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0355167 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]) | [X] - COMPUTERS AND GRAPHICS, vol. 12, no. 3/4, 1988, OXFORD, GB pages 329 - 333 Y. XIONG ET AL.: 'An Implementation of the Graphical Kernel System (GKS)' | [X] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 31, no. 4, September 1988, NEW YORK, USA pages 161 - 162 'GRAPHICS PICTURE CONVERSION PROGRAM' | [A] - AUTOMATISIERUNGSTECHNISCHE PRAXIS - ATP, vol. 31, no. 2, 1989, MÜNCHEN, DE pages 68 - 73 R. M\LLER, C. ERNESTUS: 'Konzept f}r den Transfer standardisierter graphischer Dateien von CAD- zu Prozeagraphiksytemen' |