EP0458150 - Process for producing shaped articles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.11.1995 [1995/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/48] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
von Bonin, Wulf, Dr. Droste-Hülshoff-Strasse 9 W-5068 Odenthal / DE | 02 /
von Gizycki, Ulrich, Dr. Wiembachallee 24 W-5090 Leverkusen 3 / DE | 03 /
Krüger, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing. Grometstrasse 15 W-5060 Bergisch Gladbach 1 / DE | [1991/48] | Application number, filing date | 91107663.6 | 11.05.1991 | [1991/48] | Priority number, date | DE19904016710 | 24.05.1990 Original published format: DE 4016710 | [1991/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0458150 | Date: | 27.11.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0458150 | Date: | 30.11.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/54 | [1991/48] | CPC: |
C04B35/536 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1991/48] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Formteilen | [1991/48] | English: | Process for producing shaped articles | [1991/48] | French: | Procédé pour fabriquer des pièces moulées | [1991/48] | Examination procedure | 17.12.1991 | Examination requested [1992/08] | 18.04.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.05.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2011361 (NIPPON CARBON CO LTD); | [A]US3333941 (FRANCISZEK OLSTOWSKI) |