EP0457237 - Magnetic record reproducing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.08.1999 [1999/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/35] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | ||
Former [1991/47] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ohta, Yutaka 2-20-1-1827, Higashinakaburi Hirakata-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | 02 /
Kashiro, Takao 107, Dainichi-cho 2-chome Moriguchi-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | 03 /
Nakamura, Kenjiro 13-18-201, Honmachi Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | [1991/47] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/45] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Martinistrasse 24 D-28195 Bremen / DE | ||
Former [1991/47] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Martinistrasse 24 D-28195 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 91107711.3 | 13.05.1991 | [1991/47] | Priority number, date | JP19900121944 | 11.05.1990 Original published format: JP 12194490 | JP19900286731 | 23.10.1990 Original published format: JP 28673190 | JP19910013310 | 04.02.1991 Original published format: JP 1331091 | [1991/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0457237 | Date: | 21.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0457237 | Date: | 08.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0457237 | Date: | 26.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G11B15/18, G11B15/467, H04N5/93, G11B15/14 | [1994/21] | CPC: |
G11B15/1875 (EP,US);
G11B15/4671 (EP,US);
H04N5/9305 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1991/47] | G11B15/18 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1991/47] | Title | German: | Magnetisches Aufzeichnungs-/Wiedergabegerät | [1991/47] | English: | Magnetic record reproducing apparatus | [1991/47] | French: | Appareil d'enregistrement/de reproduction magnétique | [1991/47] | Examination procedure | 13.05.1991 | Examination requested [1991/47] | 19.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.11.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0322119 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 2,3 * page 9, line 4 - page 11, line 9; figure -; claim - *; | [A]DE2730134 (STAAR SA) [A] 2,3 * page 13, line 17 - page 17, line 12; figure -; claim - *; | [A]EP0254511 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-3 * column 4, line 24 - line 40; figure -; claim - *; | [A]JPS63247946 ; | [A]JPS6045965 ; | [A]GB2211651 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1-3 * page 13, line 22 - page 23, line 13; figure -; claim - *; | [A]DE3737054 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 4 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0259195 (VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN [JP]) [A] 4 * page 9, column 16, line 64 - page 10, column 18, line 28; figures 1,22 *; | [A]GB2088620 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT) [A] 4,7 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3806330 (BROADCAST TELEVISION SYST [DE]) [A] 7 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0102809 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 7 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0209813 (THOMSON BRANDT GMBH [DE]) [A] 4 * the whole document *; | [A]US4597019 (NISHIMOTO NAOMICHI [JP], et al) [A] 4 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2189924 (TOSHIBA KK) [A] 4 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890209), vol. 13, no. 57, Database accession no. (P - 825), & JP63247946 A 19881014 (MATSUSHITA) [A] 1-3 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850716), vol. 9, no. 170, Database accession no. (P - 373), & JP60045965 A 19850312 (HITACHI) [A] 1-3 * abstract * |