EP0469256 - Device for transporting piece-goods [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.1997 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Albert Handtmann Maschinenfabrik GmbH & Co. KG Birkenallee 25-29 D-88400 Biberach / DE | [1996/12] |
Former [1992/06] | For all designated states HANDTMANN A-PUNKT AUTOMATION GMBH Löwenstrasse 8 D-88255 Baienfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Strasser, Karl-Heinz Hauptstrasse 66 W-7981 Berg b. Ravensburg / DE | 02 /
Röck, Martin, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Höll 18 W-7992 Tettnang / DE | [1992/06] | Representative(s) | Engelhardt, Guido Patentanwalt Postfach 13 50 88003 Friedrichshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/06] | Engelhardt, Guido, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Postfach 13 50 D-88003 Friedrichshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 91107813.7 | 15.05.1991 | [1992/06] | Priority number, date | DE19904024037 | 28.07.1990 Original published format: DE 4024037 | [1992/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0469256 | Date: | 05.02.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0469256 | Date: | 09.10.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B65G15/14, A22C11/00 | [1992/06] | CPC: |
B65G21/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1992/06] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zum Transport von Stückgütern | [1992/06] | English: | Device for transporting piece-goods | [1992/06] | French: | Dispositif pour tansporter des marchandises en pièce | [1992/06] | Examination procedure | 23.06.1992 | Examination requested [1992/35] | 15.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 20.10.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.03.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.03.1996 | Request for decision received: (all rights) | 02.04.1996 | Result of request for decision ((all rights)): Request granted | 11.04.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 10.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/40] | Request for further processing for: | 22.03.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 22.03.1996 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 09.10.1996 | ES | 09.10.1996 | FR | 09.10.1996 | IT | 09.10.1996 | NL | 09.10.1996 | SE | 09.01.1997 | CH | 31.05.1997 | LI | 31.05.1997 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/07] | DK | 09.10.1996 | |
ES | 09.10.1996 | ||
IT | 09.10.1996 | ||
NL | 09.10.1996 | ||
SE | 09.01.1997 | ||
FR | 07.03.1997 | ||
CH | 31.05.1997 | ||
LI | 31.05.1997 | ||
Former [2002/25] | DK | 09.10.1996 | |
ES | 09.10.1996 | ||
IT | 09.10.1996 | ||
SE | 09.01.1997 | ||
FR | 07.03.1997 | ||
CH | 31.05.1997 | ||
LI | 31.05.1997 | ||
Former [1999/42] | DK | 09.10.1996 | |
IT | 09.10.1996 | ||
SE | 09.01.1997 | ||
FR | 07.03.1997 | ||
CH | 31.05.1997 | ||
LI | 31.05.1997 | ||
Former [1998/43] | DK | 09.10.1996 | |
SE | 09.01.1997 | ||
FR | 07.03.1997 | ||
CH | 31.05.1997 | ||
LI | 31.05.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | DK | 09.10.1996 | |
SE | 09.01.1997 | ||
FR | 07.03.1997 | ||
Former [1997/39] | SE | 09.01.1997 | |
FR | 07.03.1997 | ||
Former [1997/34] | FR | 07.03.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0366904 (HANDTMANN ALBERT MASCHF [DE]); | [Y]US4112546 (MUELLER JOHANN [DE]); | [X]US4270650 (KROHN MANFRED [DE]); | [X]GB1551723 (MOLINS LTD); | [X]DE2127210 (WILD R); | [Y]DE3121432 ; | [A]DE2414386 (PACKING SIPAK S P A SOC IT); | [A]US4180156 (GRUBMAN VIKTOR G [SU], et al) |