EP0458184 - Fork lift truck [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 11.05.2001 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2001 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 27.06.2001 [2001/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Linde AG Abraham-Lincoln-Strasse 21 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/26] | For all designated states Linde Aktiengesellschaft Abraham-Lincoln-Strasse 21 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [1991/48] | For all designated states Linde Aktiengesellschaft Abraham-Lincoln-Strasse 21 D-65189 Wiesbaden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Goetz, Bernhard, Dipl.-Ing. Goldregenweg 36 W-8750 Aschaffenburg / DE | 02 /
Nägel, Dieter Nibelungenstrasse 15 W-8751 Grosswallstadt / DE | [1992/33] |
Former [1991/48] | 01 /
Goetz, Bernhard, Dipl.-Ing. Goldregenweg 36 W-8750 Aschaffenburg / DE | Representative(s) | Schaefer, Gerhard Linde Aktiengesellschaft Zentrale Patentabteilung 82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/48] | Schaefer, Gerhard, Dr. Linde Aktiengesellschaft Zentrale Patentabteilung D-82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | Application number, filing date | 91107869.9 | 15.05.1991 | [1991/48] | Priority number, date | DE19904016495 | 22.05.1990 Original published format: DE 4016495 | DE19904022450 | 14.07.1990 Original published format: DE 4022450 | [1991/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0458184 | Date: | 27.11.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0458184 | Date: | 03.08.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/31] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0458184 | Date: | 27.06.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B66F9/075 | [1991/48] | CPC: |
B66F9/07545 (EP,US);
B66F9/082 (EP,US);
Y10S414/127 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/48] | Title | German: | Gabelstapler | [1991/48] | English: | Fork lift truck | [1991/48] | French: | Chariot élévateur à fourche | [1991/48] | Examination procedure | 10.12.1991 | Examination requested [1992/06] | 16.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.11.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
02.05.1995
12.05.1995
ADMISSIBLE Steinbock Boss GmbH Steinbockstrasse 38 8052 Moosburg/Isar / DE Opponent's representative Weickmann, Heinrich Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/26] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.05.1995
12.05.1995
ADMISSIBLE Steinbock Boss GmbH Steinbockstrasse 38 8052 Moosburg/Isar / DE Opponent's representative Weickmann, Heinrich, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20 D-81635 München / DE | 06.06.1995 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 30.09.1995 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 21.06.1996 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.1996 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 17.01.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 25.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 14.05.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 18.06.1998 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 28.09.1999 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 28.09.1999 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.12.1999 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 02.12.1999 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 01.03.2001 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 23.04.2001 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2263981 (DALECKE LEONARD T, et al); | [A]GB2058012 (KALMAR LAST MASKIN VERKSTAD AB); | [A]US4403904 (CHELIN CHARLES R [US]) | Opposition | DE8602229U | DE2719217 |