EP0458223 - Apparatus for measuring the absorption of transparent probes having an unfavourable form [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.04.1995 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.04.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.05.1995 [1995/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Firma Carl Zeiss D-73446 Oberkochen / DE | [1991/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hohberg, Gerhard, Dr. Hornbergstrasse 13 W-7080 Aalen-Dewangen / DE | 02 /
Matthes, Axel Bussardweg 10 W-7923 Königsbronn / DE | 03 /
Schlemmer, Harry, Dr. Einsteinstrasse 16 W-7082 Oberkochen / DE | [1991/48] | Application number, filing date | 91108070.3 | 18.05.1991 | [1991/48] | Priority number, date | DE19900005845U | 23.05.1990 Original published format: DE 9005845 U | [1991/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0458223 | Date: | 27.11.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0458223 | Date: | 15.04.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/59, G01J3/42 | [1991/48] | CPC: |
G01N21/59 (EP,US);
G01N21/87 (EP,US);
G01N2201/06126 (EP,US);
G01N2201/065 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, LI, NL [1991/48] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Messung der Absorption von transparenten Proben mit ungünstiger Aussenform | [1991/48] | English: | Apparatus for measuring the absorption of transparent probes having an unfavourable form | [1991/48] | French: | Appareil pour mesurer l'absorption d'échantillons transparents d'une forme défavorable | [1991/48] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 28.09.1992 | Examination requested [1992/48] | 01.12.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/22] | 05.01.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1995/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1994 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP56122936 ; | [X]US4093991 (CHRISTIE JR JOHN S, et al); | [Y]GB2110416 (KALNEW OPTICAL IND); | [Y]GB2010474 (HORCHLER S); | [Y]US4259011 (CRUMM JOHN C, et al); | [A]US3944368 (BEESLEY CASPER R); | [AD]DE3818815 (ZEISS CARL FA [DE]); | [A]FR2340546 (DIHACO DIAMANTEN HANDELS CO [LI]) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 5, no. 201 (P-94)(873) 19. Dezember 1981 & JP-A-56 122 936 ( SHIMAZU SEISAKUSHO ) 26. September 1981, & JP56122936 A 00000000 |