EP0459259 - Disazo dyes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.1995 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.11.1995 [1995/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/49] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hinrichs, Rolf, Dr. Bernhard-Letterhaus-Strasse 16 W-5090 Leverkusen 1 / DE | 02 /
Kunde, Klaus, Dr. Moltkestrasse 5 W-5206 Neuenkirchen 1 / DE | [1991/49] | Application number, filing date | 91108085.1 | 18.05.1991 | [1991/49] | Priority number, date | DE19904017569 | 31.05.1990 Original published format: DE 4017569 | [1991/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0459259 | Date: | 04.12.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0459259 | Date: | 30.11.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C09B45/28 | [1991/49] | CPC: |
C09B45/28 (EP,US);
Y10S8/918 (US);
Y10S8/919 (US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1991/49] | Title | German: | Disazofarbstoffe | [1991/49] | English: | Disazo dyes | [1991/49] | French: | Colorants disazoiques | [1991/49] | Examination procedure | 17.12.1991 | Examination requested [1992/08] | 11.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.05.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP57145155 ; | [A]DE3236238 (SANDOZ AG [DE]); | [A]EP0301350 (BAYER AG [DE]) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 98, Nr. 10, März 1983, Seite 76, Zusammenfassung Nr. 73825f, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-57 145 155 (NIPPON KAYAKU CO., LTD) 08-09-1982, & JP57145155 A 00000000 |