Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
15.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.05.1996 [1996/18] |
24.03.1995 | (Expected) grant | published on 10.05.1995 [1995/19] |
29.07.1993 | First examination report | |
09.10.1992 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 25.11.1992 [1992/48] |
09.10.1992 | Request for examination filed | published on 25.11.1992 [1992/48] |