Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0514565 | Global Dossier | 10.05.1995 | B1 | EP0514565 | 25.11.1992 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP91108179 | 21.05.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2068916 | 08.05.2001 | C | CA2068916 | 22.11.1992 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP91108179 | 21.05.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59105461D1 | 14.06.1995 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP91108179 | 21.05.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5259261 | 09.11.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | EP91108179 | 21.05.1991 |