EP0462409 - Process for the production of tube shaped mouldings out of high temperature superconductor material and plant for carrying out this process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.05.1995 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.07.1995 [1995/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/01] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [1991/52] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Hanauer Landstrasse 526 D-60386 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Preisler, Eberhard, Dr. Bertolt-Brecht-Strasse 55 W-5042 Erftstadt / DE | 02 /
Bock, Joachim, Dr. Geschwister-Scholl-Strasse 4a W-5042 Erftstadt / DE | 03 /
Holzem, Johannes Bachemer Strasse 39 W-5030 Hürth / DE | 04 /
Dorn, Friedrich-Wilhelm, Dr. Giselherweg 3 W-5030 Hürth / DE | [1991/52] | Application number, filing date | 91108291.5 | 23.05.1991 | [1991/52] | Priority number, date | DE19904019368 | 18.06.1990 Original published format: DE 4019368 | [1991/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0462409 | Date: | 27.12.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0462409 | Date: | 13.07.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/00, H01B12/02, H01L39/24, B28B21/30, B22D13/02 | [1991/52] | CPC: |
C04B35/4521 (EP,KR,US);
B22D13/02 (EP,KR,US);
B28B21/30 (EP,KR,US);
C04B35/653 (EP,KR,US);
H10N60/0268 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/52] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung rohrförmiger Formteile aus Hochtemperatur-Supraleiter-Material sowie eine Anlage zu seiner Durchführung | [1991/52] | English: | Process for the production of tube shaped mouldings out of high temperature superconductor material and plant for carrying out this process | [1991/52] | French: | Procédé de production de pièces moulées tubulaires d'un matériau supraconducteur à haute température et usine pour son exécution | [1991/52] | Examination procedure | 08.01.1992 | Examination requested [1992/11] | 26.10.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.11.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.12.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 31.12.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3509235 (PONT A MOUSSON); | [Y]EP0344813 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]); | [YD]DE3830092 (HOECHST AG [DE]) |