EP0459295 - Aircraft docking guidance system which takes position reference in anti-collision light of aircraft [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 21.05.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.1999 | Opposition rejected | published on 07.07.1999 [1999/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOSHIBA ELECTRONIC SYSTEMS CO., LTD. 5-1, 2-chome, Akasaka, Minato-ku Tokyo 107 / JP | For all designated states ANA MOTOR SERVICE CO., LTD. 7-6, 1-chome, Haneda Airport, Ota-ku Tokyo 144 / JP | [1991/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sato, Tetsuo 4-1-2-306, Azamino, Midori-ku Yokohama-shi / JP | 02 /
Muranaka, Susumu 508 Prime-Kashimada, 292-3, Shimohirama Saiwai-ku, Kawasaki-shi / JP | [1991/49] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/49] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner Möhlstrasse 37 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91108321.0 | 22.05.1991 | [1991/49] | Priority number, date | JP19900133908 | 25.05.1990 Original published format: JP 13390890 | [1991/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0459295 | Date: | 04.12.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0459295 | Date: | 09.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0459295 | Date: | 17.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G05D1/02, B64F1/00, G09G5/06, G05D1/03 | [1993/23] | CPC: |
G05D1/0083 (EP,US);
B64F1/002 (EP,US);
G01S11/12 (EP,US);
G05D1/0225 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1991/49] | G05D1/02, B64F1/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1991/49] | Title | German: | Andockungsführungssystem eines Flugzeuges mit Anwendung der Kollisionsvermeidungsleuchten für die Referenzposition | [1991/49] | English: | Aircraft docking guidance system which takes position reference in anti-collision light of aircraft | [1991/49] | French: | Système de guidage pour le garage d'un avion avec utilisation de l'éclairage anti-collision pour fournir la référence de position | [1991/49] | Examination procedure | 19.06.1991 | Examination requested [1991/49] | 04.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.07.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
17.10.1996
29.10.1996
ADMISSIBLE Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/50] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.10.1996
Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 D-80506 München / DE | 28.11.1996 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 07.04.1997 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 03.12.1998 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1999/27] | 03.12.1998 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.12.1998 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 12.02.1999 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2224613 (ELECTRO OPTICS IND LTD [IL]) | [Y] - IEEE JOURNAL OF ROBOTICS AND AUTOMATION vol. RA-3, no. 3, June 1987, NEW YORK US pages 239 - 248 L.MATTHIES ET AL 'Error Modelling in Stereo Navigation' | [A] - 1986 PROCEEDINGS OF FALL JOINT COMPUTER CONFERENCE 2 November 1986, DALLAS,TEXAS,USA pages 105 - 113 Y.MATSUZAKI ET AL 'CMU Sidewalk Navigation System: A Blackboard -Based Outdoor Navigation System Using Sensor Fusion with Colored-Range Images' | Examination | - TEXAS,USA pages 105 - 113 Y.MATSUZAKI ET AL 'CMU Sidewalk Navigation System: A Blackboard -Based Outdoor Navigation System Using Sensor Fusion with Colored- Range Images' |