EP0489223 - Method for clock rate conversion of a digital signal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.07.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.09.1997 [1997/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsche ITT Industries GmbH Hans-Bunte-Strasse 19 79108 Freiburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/24] | For all designated states Deutsche ITT Industries GmbH Hans-Bunte-Strasse 19 D-79108 Freiburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Butera, Bill Rosenweg 56 W-7830 Emmendingen / DE | 02 /
Alrutz, Herbert H., Dr.rer.nat. Sonnhalde 3 W-7806 March / DE | [1992/24] | Application number, filing date | 91108409.3 | 24.05.1991 | [1992/24] | Priority number, date | EP19900123312 | 05.12.1990 Original published format: EP 90123312 | [1992/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0489223 | Date: | 10.06.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0489223 | Date: | 14.04.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0489223 | Date: | 18.09.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/66, H04N7/26 | [1996/38] | CPC: |
H04N19/63 (EP);
H04N7/0117 (KR);
H03H17/0266 (KR);
H03H17/045 (KR);
H03H7/12 (KR);
H04B1/667 (EP);
H04N11/16 (KR);
H04N11/20 (KR);
H04N7/24 (EP);
H04N9/67 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1992/24] | H04B1/66, H04N7/13 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1992/24] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Taktratenumsetzung eines digitalisierten Signals | [1992/24] | English: | Method for clock rate conversion of a digital signal | [1992/24] | French: | Procédé de conversion de la cadence d'horloge d'un signal numérisé | [1992/24] | Examination procedure | 02.10.1993 | Examination requested [1993/48] | 25.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.02.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.07.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Opposition(s) | 19.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/37] | Request for further processing for: | 11.07.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 11.07.1996 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.07.1996 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |