EP0459340 - Photographic element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.04.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.04.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.05.1995 [1995/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/49] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nelson, John Victor, c/o EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 02 /
Bowne, Arlyce Tolman, c/o EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 03 /
Bistrovich, Terry Lee, c/o EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | [1991/49] | Representative(s) | Brandes, Jürgen, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/49] | Brandes, Jürgen, Dr. rer. nat., et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91108562.9 | 27.05.1991 | [1991/49] | Priority number, date | US19900529290 | 29.05.1990 Original published format: US 529290 | [1991/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0459340 | Date: | 04.12.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G03C7/30 | [1991/49] | CPC: |
G03C7/301 (EP,US);
G03C7/39236 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1991/49] | Title | German: | Photographisches Element | [1991/49] | English: | Photographic element | [1991/49] | French: | Elément photographique | [1991/49] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 21.05.1992 | Examination requested [1992/30] | 01.12.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/21] | 30.12.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1995/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1994 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0272604 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]); | [Y]EP0338785 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]); | [A]EP0359169 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) |