EP0459381 - Process for the preparation of 10-(2-propynyl)ester-4-ene-3,17-dione [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.01.1998 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.03.1998 [1998/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MERRELL PHARMACEUTICALS INC. 2110 East Galbraith Road, P.O. Box 156300 Cincinnati Ohio 45215-6300 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/16] | For all designated states MERRELL PHARMACEUTICALS INC. 2110 East Galbraith Road, P.O. Box 156300 Cincinnati, Ohio 45215-6300 / US | ||
Former [1991/49] | For all designated states MERRELL DOW PHARMACEUTICALS INC. 2110 East Galbraith Road, P.O. Box 156300 Cincinnati Ohio 45215-6300 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Whitten, Jeffrey P. 9680 Tamarack Terrace Cincinnati, Ohio 45241 / US | 02 /
Benson, Harvey D. 9627 Whippoorwill Lane Mason, Ohio 45040 / US | 03 /
Rand, Cynthia L. 230 Barden Road Sanford, Michigan 48657 / US | [1991/49] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/49] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91108664.3 | 28.05.1991 | [1991/49] | Priority number, date | US19900530674 | 30.05.1990 Original published format: US 530674 | [1991/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0459381 | Date: | 04.12.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0459381 | Date: | 10.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0459381 | Date: | 19.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C07J1/00, C07J21/00, C07J71/00, C07J51/00 | [1992/24] | CPC: |
C07J1/0059 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07J21/008 (EP);
C07J51/00 (EP);
C07J71/001 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1991/49] | C07J1/00, // C07J21/00, C07J71/00, C07J51/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/49] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von 10-(2-Propynyl)estr-4-en-3,17-dion | [1991/49] | English: | Process for the preparation of 10-(2-propynyl)ester-4-ene-3,17-dione | [1991/49] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation de 10-(2-propynyle)estr-4-ène, 3,17-dione | [1991/49] | Examination procedure | 20.11.1992 | Examination requested [1993/03] | 17.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 22.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 29.07.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD] - JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY. vol. 32, no. 1, January 1989, WASHINGTON US pages 203 - 213; P. J. BEDNARSKI ET AL: 'Interactions of Thiol-Containing Androgens with Human Placental Aromatase' | [A] - JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. vol. 90, no. 5, 28 February 1968, GASTON, PA US pages 1249 - 1253; S. W. SMITH ET AL: 'The gem-Dialkyl Effect. II. A Comparison of the Kinetic and Equilibrium Approaches to the Selective Ketalisation of 5-alpha-Androstane-3,17-dione with Various Glycols' |