blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0459416

EP0459416 - Dye fixing element [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.11.1997
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip07.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): NL
published on 09.01.2008  [2008/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD.
210 Nakanuma
Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa 250-0123 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1991/49]For all designated states
FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD.
210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi
Kanagawa 250-01 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Nakamura, Yoshisada
c/o FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD., No. 210, Nakanuma
Minami Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa / JP
02 / Seto, Nobuo
c/o FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD., No. 210, Nakanuma
Minami Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa / JP
03 / Morigaki, Masakazu
c/o FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD., No. 210, Nakanuma
Minami Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa / JP
[1991/49]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1991/49]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
D-80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date91108723.728.05.1991
[1991/49]
Priority number, dateJP1990013788428.05.1990         Original published format: JP 13788490
JP1990024581314.09.1990         Original published format: JP 24581390
[1991/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0459416
Date:04.12.1991
Language:EN
[1991/49]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0459416
Date:02.01.1992
Language:EN
[1992/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0459416
Date:02.01.1997
Language:EN
[1997/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.11.1991
ClassificationIPC:G03C8/26, G03C8/56
[1991/49]
CPC:
G03C8/56 (EP,US); G03C8/26 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1991/49]
TitleGerman:Farbstoff-Fixierelement[1997/01]
English:Dye fixing element[1991/49]
French:Elément fixateur de colorant[1991/49]
Former [1991/49]Element zum Befestigen von Farbstoffen
Examination procedure27.02.1992Examination requested  [1992/17]
08.03.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.09.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.02.1996Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
28.06.1996Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.08.1996Fee for grant paid
23.08.1996Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.10.1997No opposition filed within time limit [1997/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.05.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
30.05.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
31.05.1995Renewal fee patent year 05
31.05.1996Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT02.01.1997
NL02.01.1997
[2003/07]
Former [1999/42]IT02.01.1997
Documents cited:Search[Y]JP1201656  ;
 [Y]JPS568138  (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD);
 [Y]EP0160947  (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP])
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 502 (P-958)(3850) 13 November 1989 & JP-A-1 201 656 ( KONICA ) 14 August 1989, & JP1201656 A 19890814
 [A]  - RESEARCH DISCLOSURE no. 167, March 1978, HAVANT,GB pages 32 - 33; 'Color diffusion transfer photographic material'
ExaminationEP0426087
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.