blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0463407

EP0463407 - Use of dihydropyridins in cardiotonic pharmaceutical compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.12.2002
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip07.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 09.01.2008  [2008/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mitsubishi Pharma Corporation
6-9, Hiranomachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 541-0046 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2002/05]For all designated states
Mitsubishi Pharma Corporation
6-9, Hiranomachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0046 / JP
Former [2001/10]For all designated states
Welfide Corporation
6-9, Hirano-machi 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu / JP
Former [1999/41]For all designated states
YOSHITOMI PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD.
6-9, Hiranomachi 2-chome Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka / JP
Former [1992/01]For all designated states
THE GREEN CROSS CORPORATION
3-3, Imabashi 1-chome Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Uchida, Takeshi, c/o The Green Cross Corporation
Central Research Lab., 2-1180-1, Shodaiohtani
Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573 / JP
02 / Ohtaki, Yutaka, c/o The Green Cross Corporation
Central Research Lab., 2-1180-1, Shodaiohtani
Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573 / JP
03 / Kido, Hideaki, c/o The Green Cross Corporation
Central Research Lab., 2-1180-1, Shodaiohtani
Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573 / JP
04 / Watanabe, Masahiro, c/o The Green Cross Corp.
Central Research Lab., 2-1180-1, Shodaiohtani
Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573 / JP
[1992/01]
Representative(s)dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [1992/01]von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al
Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41
D-50462 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date91109081.904.06.1991
[1992/01]
Priority number, dateJP1990016609325.06.1990         Original published format: JP 16609390
[1992/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0463407
Date:02.01.1992
Language:EN
[1992/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0463407
Date:23.12.1992
Language:EN
[1992/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0463407
Date:13.02.2002
Language:EN
[2002/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.11.1992
ClassificationIPC:A61K31/444, A61K31/496, A61K31/4427, A61K31/4422, A61P9/04
[2001/08]
CPC:
A61K31/44 (EP,KR); A61P9/04 (EP)
Former IPC [2001/06]A61K31/444, A61K31/496, A61K31/4427, A61K31/4422
Former IPC [1992/52]A61K31/44, A61K31/495
Former IPC [1992/01]A61K31/44
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1992/01]
TitleGerman:Verwendung von Dihydropyridinen in kardiotonischen pharmazeutischen Zusammensetzungen[1992/01]
English:Use of dihydropyridins in cardiotonic pharmaceutical compositions[1992/01]
French:Utilisation des dérivés de la dihydropyridine dans des compositions pharmaceutiques cardiotoniques[1992/01]
Examination procedure26.02.1993Examination requested  [1993/17]
31.01.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.07.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.02.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.06.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.02.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.08.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.01.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
10.05.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
29.05.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.06.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.07.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.11.2001Fee for grant paid
02.11.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.11.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2003/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.06.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
28.06.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
26.06.1995Renewal fee patent year 05
26.06.1996Renewal fee patent year 06
27.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 07
27.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 08
29.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 09
29.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 10
23.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 11
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE13.02.2002
CH13.02.2002
IT13.02.2002
LI13.02.2002
NL13.02.2002
DK13.05.2002
SE13.05.2002
ES29.08.2002
[2008/02]
Former [2004/04]BE13.02.2002
CH13.02.2002
LI13.02.2002
NL13.02.2002
DK13.05.2002
SE13.05.2002
ES29.08.2002
Former [2003/45]BE13.02.2002
CH13.02.2002
LI13.02.2002
NL13.02.2002
DK13.05.2002
SE13.05.2002
Former [2003/06]BE13.02.2002
CH13.02.2002
LI13.02.2002
NL13.02.2002
SE13.05.2002
Former [2003/01]CH13.02.2002
LI13.02.2002
SE13.05.2002
Former [2002/37]SE13.05.2002
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0257616  (GREEN CROSS CORP [JP]);
 [Y]US4735956  (BALDWIN JOHN J [US], et al);
 [X]EP0342577  (GREEN CROSS CORP [JP]);
 [XP]EP0379737  (GREEN CROSS CORP [JP])
 [X]  - FOLIA PHARMACOLOGICA JAPONICA, vol. 95, no. 4, April 1990, pages 177-184; H. KIDO et al.: "Angiographic studies on the effects of a novel calcium antagonist AE0047 on cerebral arteries in dogs, with special reference to the preventive effects of AE0047 on cerebral vasoconstriction induced by endothelin"
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.