Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] |
03.09.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 20.10.1999 [1999/42] |
01.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.12.1995 [1995/51] |
11.11.1994 | (Expected) grant | published on 28.12.1994 [1994/52] |
03.11.1993 | First examination report | |
29.09.1992 | Request for examination filed | published on 19.11.1992 [1992/47] |
19.03.1992 | Publication of search report | published on 06.05.1992 [1992/19] |
25.10.1991 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 11.12.1991 [1991/50] |