Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0439858 | 10.02.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | JP14455090 | 04.06.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0439859 | 10.02.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | JP14455190 | 04.06.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0439860 | 10.02.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | JP14455290 | 04.06.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0439863 | 10.02.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | JP14455390 | 04.06.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0460617 | Global Dossier | 28.12.1994 | B1 | EP0460617 | 06.05.1992 | A3 | EP0460617 | 11.12.1991 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP14455390 | 04.06.1990 | JP14455290 | 04.06.1990 | JP14455190 | 04.06.1990 | JP14455090 | 04.06.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2043472 | 05.12.1991 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP14455390 | 04.06.1990 | JP14455290 | 04.06.1990 | JP14455190 | 04.06.1990 | JP14455090 | 04.06.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69106224T | 24.05.1995 | T2 | DE69106224D1 | 09.02.1995 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP14455390 | 04.06.1990 | JP14455290 | 04.06.1990 | JP14455190 | 04.06.1990 | JP14455090 | 04.06.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5187035 | 16.02.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | JP14455390 | 04.06.1990 | JP14455290 | 04.06.1990 | JP14455190 | 04.06.1990 | JP14455090 | 04.06.1990 |