EP0462445 - Dual wheel fastening on tractors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.1994 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nubbemeyer, Heinrich Emskamp 10 D-49584 Fürstenau / DE | [1991/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1991/52] | Representative(s) | Schulze Horn, Stefan Goldstrasse 50 48147 Münster / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/52] | Schulze Horn, Stefan, Dipl.-Ing. M.Sc. Goldstrasse 50 D-48147 Münster / DE | Application number, filing date | 91109216.1 | 06.06.1991 | [1991/52] | Priority number, date | DE19904034490 | 30.10.1990 Original published format: DE 4034490 | DE19900006871U | 19.06.1990 Original published format: DE 9006871 U | [1991/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0462445 | Date: | 27.12.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0462445 | Date: | 03.11.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B60B11/02 | [1991/52] | CPC: |
B60B11/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1991/52] | Title | German: | Verbindung für Zwillingsräder an Traktoren | [1991/52] | English: | Dual wheel fastening on tractors | [1991/52] | French: | Dispositif de jumelage aux tracteurs | [1991/52] | Examination procedure | 22.01.1992 | Examination requested [1992/13] | 02.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.05.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 03.11.1993 | IT | 03.11.1993 | [2008/02] |
Former [1999/42] | GB | 03.11.1993 | |
IT | 03.11.1993 | ||
Former [1994/49] | GB | 03.11.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0049420 ; | [YP]EP0392178 ; | [Y]WO8201687 ; | [Y]US4787679 ; | [A]US1780404 |