EP0461553 - Hair-curler [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.06.1995 [1995/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Buheitel, Horst Fabrikstrasse 20 D-95111 Rehau / DE | [1991/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1991/51] | Representative(s) | Tergau, Enno Tergau & Walkenhorst Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwälte Mögeldorfer Hauptstrasse 51 90482 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/45] | Tergau, Enno, Dipl.-Ing. Tergau & Pohl Patentanwälte Mögeldorfer Hauptstrasse 51 D-90482 Nürnberg / DE | ||
Former [1992/36] | Tergau, Enno, Dipl.-Ing. Tergau & Pohl Patentanwälte Mögeldorfer Hauptstrasse 51 D-90482 Nürnberg / DE | ||
Former [1991/51] | Tergau, Enno, Dipl.-Ing. Tergau & Pohl Patentanwälte Mögeldorfer Hauptstrasse 51 D-90482 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 91109341.7 | 07.06.1991 | [1991/51] | Priority number, date | DE19900006705U | 13.06.1990 Original published format: DE 9006705 U | [1991/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0461553 | Date: | 18.12.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0461553 | Date: | 06.07.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A45D2/28 | [1991/51] | CPC: |
A45D2/125 (EP);
A45D2/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1991/51] | Title | German: | Dauerwellwickel | [1991/51] | English: | Hair-curler | [1991/51] | French: | Bigoudi | [1991/51] | Examination procedure | 25.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/17] | 05.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.11.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]AT142791B (KAHLHOFER HEINZ); | [A]DE3138003 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]); | [A]DE3406065 (KUCH WALTER); | [A]DE3517534 (HOELLERING HANS JOACHIM) |