EP0450668 - Semiconductor laser array having power and high beam quality [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.01.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.02.1997 [1997/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TRW INC. 1900 Richmond Road Cleveland Ohio 44124 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/41] | For all designated states TRW INC. 1900 Richmond Road Cleveland Ohio 44124 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Botez, Dan 234 Paseo de Las Delicias Redondo Beach, California 90277 / US | 02 /
Jansen, Michael 7530, Cowan Avenue Los Angeles, California 90045 / US | 03 /
Mawst, Luke J. 22213 Redbeam Torrance, California 95050 / US | 04 /
Peterson, Gary Lee 4531 Montair Avenue, Apt. A25 Long Beach, California 90808 / US | 05 /
Simmons, William Walter 4181 Maritime Dr. Rancho Palos Verdes, California 90274 / US | 06 /
Wilcox, Jaroslava Zitkova 235 N. Kenter Ave. Los Angeles, California 90049 / US | 07 /
Yang, Jane Jan Jan 728 S. Bristol Ave Los Angeles, California 90049 / US | [1991/41] | Representative(s) | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/41] | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 91109377.1 | 28.09.1989 | [1991/41] | Priority number, date | US19880254905 | 07.10.1988 Original published format: US 254905 | [1991/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0450668 | Date: | 09.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0450668 | Date: | 23.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0450668 | Date: | 28.02.1996 | [1996/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H01S3/25, H01S3/098 | [1991/41] | CPC: |
H01S5/4062 (EP,US);
H01S5/148 (EP,US);
H01S5/4068 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/41] | Title | German: | Halbleiterlaser-Array mit hoher Ausgangsleistung und hoher Strahlqualität | [1996/09] | English: | Semiconductor laser array having power and high beam quality | [1991/41] | French: | Réseau à laser à semi-conducteur à haute puissance et à faisceau de haute qualité | [1991/41] |
Former [1991/41] | Vielfachhalbleiterlaser mit grosser Ausgangsleistung und hoher Strahlqualität | Examination procedure | 17.06.1991 | Examination requested [1991/41] | 07.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.04.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.08.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP89309891.3 / EP0363076 | Opposition(s) | 29.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1991 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   06.11.1991 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP] - ELECTRONICS LETTERS, vol. 25, no. 5, 2nd March 1989, pages 365-366, Stevenage, Herts, GB; L.J. MAWST et al.: "Phase-locked array of anti-guided lasers with monolithic spatial filter" | [XP] - APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, vol. 54, no. 22, 29th May 1989, pages 2183-2185, Am. Inst. Phys., New York, US; D. BOTEZ et al.: "Resonant optical transmission and coupling and phase-locked diode laser arrays of antiguides: The resonant optical waveguide array" | [A] - INTERNATIONAL ELECTRON DEVICES MEETING (IEDM), 1980, TECHNICAL DIGEST, Washington, DC, 8th - 10th December 1980, pages 362-365, IEEE, New York, US; D.E. ACKLEY et al.: "High-power leaky-mode multiple-stripe laser" | [A] - APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, vol. 53, no. 6, 8th August 1988, pages 464-466, Am. Inst. Phys., New York, US; D. BOTEZ et al.: "High-power, diffraction-limited-beam operation from phase-locked diode-laser arrays of closely-spaced "leaky" waveguides (antiguides)" | [A] - APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, vol. 48, no. 26, 30th June 1986, pages 1770-1772, Am. Inst. Phys., New York, NY, US; S. WANG et al.: "In-phase locking in diffraction-coupled phased-array lasers" |