blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0463440

EP0463440 - Method of driving a circuit arrangement for a contactless controlled sanitary device and circuit for carrying out this method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.03.1996
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip08.03.1996No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 24.04.1996 [1996/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HANSA METALLWERKE AG
Sigmaringer Strasse 107
70567 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [1992/01]For all designated states
HANSA METALLWERKE AG
Sigmaringer Strasse 107
D-70567 Stuttgart / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Kunkel, Horst
Mittenfeldstrasse 3
W-7000 Stuttgart 31 / DE
[1992/01]
Representative(s)Ostertag, Ulrich, et al
Ostertag & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Epplestrasse 14
70597 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [1992/01]Ostertag, Ulrich, et al
Patentanwälte Dr. Ulrich Ostertag Dr. Reinhard Ostertag Eibenweg 10
D-70597 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date91109428.208.06.1991
[1992/01]
Priority number, dateDE1990401992722.06.1990         Original published format: DE 4019927
[1992/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0463440
Date:02.01.1992
Language:DE
[1992/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0463440
Date:26.08.1992
Language:DE
[1992/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0463440
Date:03.05.1995
Language:DE
[1995/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.07.1992
ClassificationIPC:G01S17/02, E03C1/00, H03K17/945
[1992/01]
CPC:
H03K17/941 (EP,US); G01S17/04 (EP,US); G01S2007/4975 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DK,   FR,   IT,   LI,   NL [1992/01]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Betreiben einer Schaltungsanordnung für eine berührungslos gesteuerte Sanitärarmatur und Schaltungsanordnung zur Durchführung dieses Verfahrens[1992/01]
English:Method of driving a circuit arrangement for a contactless controlled sanitary device and circuit for carrying out this method[1992/01]
French:Méthode d'utilisation de circuit destiné à commander sans contact une armature sanitaire et circuit pour la réalisation de cette méthode[1992/01]
Examination procedure31.07.1992Examination requested  [1992/39]
20.09.1994Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
03.11.1994Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.01.1995Fee for grant paid
16.01.1995Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.02.1996No opposition filed within time limit [1996/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.06.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
22.06.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]DE2836734  (HANSA METALLWERKE AG);
 [A]WO8911710  (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.