EP0463449 - Adjustable glue scraper for glue roller in a labelling machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.09.1994 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.11.1994 [1994/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KHS ETI-TEC Maschinenbau GmbH Feldheider Strasse 45 40699 Erkrath / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/01] | For all designated states KHS ETI-TEC MASCHINENBAU GmbH Feldheider Strasse 45 D-40699 Erkrath / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zodrow, Rudolf Lichtstrasse 37 W-4000 Düsseldorf / DE | 02 /
Nitschke, Werner Rostocker Strasse 47 W-4000 Düsseldorf / DE | [1992/01] | Application number, filing date | 91109484.5 | 08.06.1991 | [1992/01] | Priority number, date | DE19904019409 | 18.06.1990 Original published format: DE 4019409 | DE19914102022 | 24.01.1991 Original published format: DE 4102022 | [1992/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0463449 | Date: | 02.01.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0463449 | Date: | 24.11.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B65C9/22 | [1992/01] | CPC: |
B65C9/2269 (EP,US);
B65C2009/0078 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1798 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1992/01] | Title | German: | An einer Leimwalze anstellbarer Leimschaber in einer Etikettiermaschine | [1992/01] | English: | Adjustable glue scraper for glue roller in a labelling machine | [1992/01] | French: | Râcleur de colle réglable par rapport à un rouleau encolleur dans une machine d'étiquetage | [1992/01] | Examination procedure | 29.04.1992 | Examination requested [1992/26] | 01.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.05.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1993 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   24.08.1993 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3300008 (JAGENBERG AG [DE]); | [A]DE8512017U ; | [Y]DE8706761U |