EP0464403 - Device for determining the relative rotational speed between two members, such as the support members of a vehicle wheel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.06.1994 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.08.1994 [1994/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SKF INDUSTRIE S.P.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele II No. 48 I-10123 Torino / IT | [1992/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moretti, Roberto Via Martiri della Libertà No.33/10 I-10020 Cambiano (Torino) / IT | 02 /
Genero, Matteo Via Samby No. 99 I-10021 Cambiano (Torino) / IT | [1992/02] | Representative(s) | Lotti, Giorgio c/o Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele II, 61 10128 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1993/17] | Lotti, Giorgio c/o Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele II, 61 I-10128 Torino / IT | ||
Former [1992/02] | Lotti, Giorgio c/o Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele II, 61 I-10128 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 91109509.9 | 10.06.1991 | [1992/02] | Priority number, date | IT19900067491 | 04.07.1990 Original published format: IT 6749190 | [1992/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0464403 | Date: | 08.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G01P3/487 | [1992/02] | CPC: |
F16C41/007 (EP);
G01P3/443 (EP);
F16C2326/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1992/02] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Erfassung der relativen Geschwindigkeit zwischen zwei Teilen, zum Beispiel den Tragelementen eines Kraftfahrzeugrades | [1992/02] | English: | Device for determining the relative rotational speed between two members, such as the support members of a vehicle wheel | [1992/02] | French: | Dispositif pour déterminer la vitesse relative de rotation entre deux éléments, par exemple les éléments de support d'une roue d'un véhicule | [1992/02] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 11.06.1992 | Examination requested [1992/35] | 23.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/31] | 04.03.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1281549 (SIEMENS AG); | [X]GB1504791 (POLYMOTOR ITALIANA SPA); | [Y]DE2942873 (STANDARD ELEKTRIK LORENZ AG [DE]); | [Y]EP0250275 (ROULEMENTS SOC NOUVELLE [FR]) |