EP0471161 - Spray container containing nitroglycerin in a hydrophilic aqueous composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.1995 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.08.1995 [1995/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCHWARZ PHARMA AG Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 10 40789 Monheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/08] | For all designated states SCHWARZ PHARMA AG Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 10 D-40789 Monheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klokkers-Bethke, Karin, Dr. Görlitzer Strasse 16 W-6074 Rödermark / DE | 02 /
Münch, Ulrich, Dr. Am Wald 34 W-4019 Monheim/Rhld. / DE | [1992/08] | Application number, filing date | 91109613.9 | 12.06.1991 | [1992/08] | Priority number, date | DE19904026072 | 17.08.1990 Original published format: DE 4026072 | [1992/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0471161 | Date: | 19.02.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0471161 | Date: | 31.08.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/21, A61K9/12, A61K9/72, A61K47/10 | [1992/08] | CPC: |
A61K9/006 (EP,US);
A61K31/21 (EP,US);
A61P9/06 (EP);
A61P9/08 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1994/26] |
Former [1992/08] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Nitroglycerinhaltiger, hydrophiler, wässriger Pumpspray | [1992/08] | English: | Spray container containing nitroglycerin in a hydrophilic aqueous composition | [1992/08] | French: | Atomiseur pharmaceutique contenant nitroglycérine à base d'une composition hydrophilique, aqueuse | [1992/08] | Examination procedure | 12.06.1991 | Examination requested [1992/08] | 25.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 02.02.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 11.02.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 10.03.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0241847 (MACK CHEM PHARM [DE]); | [YD]EP0310910 (NIPPON KAYAKU KK [JP]); | [YD]FR2633933 (EGYT GYOGYSZERVEGYESZETI GYAR [HU]) |