EP0519099 - Direct compression cyclophosphamide tablet [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 19.01.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton, NJ 08543 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company 345 Park Avenue New York NY 10154 / US | ||
Former [1992/52] | For all designated states BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY 345 Park Avenue New York, N.Y. 10154-0037 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gallian, Claude E. 4011 Frame Road Newburgh Indiana 47630 / US | 02 /
Williams, Charles deceased deceased / US | [1992/52] | Representative(s) | Kinzebach, Werner, et al Reitstötter, Kinzebach & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 86 06 49 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/52] | Kinzebach, Werner, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Reitstötter, Kinzebach und Partner Postfach 86 06 49 D-81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91110086.5 | 19.06.1991 | [1992/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0519099 | Date: | 23.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/675, A61K9/20 | [1992/52] | CPC: |
A61K9/286 (EP,US);
A61K31/675 (EP,US);
A61K9/2059 (EP,US);
A61K9/2866 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61K9/2095 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/52] | Title | German: | Direktkomprimierte Cyclophosphamidtablette | [1992/52] | English: | Direct compression cyclophosphamide tablet | [1992/52] | French: | Comprimé de cyclophosphamide à compression directe | [1992/52] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 14.05.1993 | Examination requested [1993/29] | 19.04.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 27.09.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1996/10] | 09.10.1995 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1996/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0298666 (AMERICAN HOME PROD [US]) | [A] - STN INTERNATIONAL INFORMATION SERVICES DATABASE: CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 101, no. 6, 1984, accession no. 43474d, Columbus, Ohio, US; T. WAGNER et al.: "Bioavailability of cyclophosphamida from oral formulations", & EUR. J. CLIN. PHARMACOL., 26(2), 269-70 |