blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0463578

EP0463578 - Process for producing spray plated metal strip [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.10.1995
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip26.10.1995No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 13.12.1995 [1995/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nippon Steel Corporation
6-3 Otemachi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100 / JP
For all designated states
Ohnaka, Itsuo
1-32-21, Higashitoyonaka-cho Toyonaka-shi
Osaka / JP
[N/P]
Former [1992/01]For all designated states
NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION
6-3 Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100 / JP
For all designated states
Ohnaka, Itsuo
1-32-21, Higashitoyonaka-cho
Toyonaka-shi, Osaka / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yamaguchi, Susumu
Nippon Steel Corporation 1-1-1, Edamitsu
Yahatahigashi-ku Kitakyushu-shi Fukoka / JP
02 / Miki, Toshihiko
Nippon Steel Corporation 1-1-1, Edamitsu
Yahatahigashi-ku Kitakyushu-shi Fukoka / JP
03 / Uchida, Hiroyuki
Nippon Steel Corporation 1-1-1, Edamitsu
Yahatahigashi-ku Kitakyushu-shi Fukoka / JP
04 / Ohnaka, Itsuo
1-32-21, Higashitoyonaka-cho
Toyonaka-shi, Osaka / JP
[1992/01]
Representative(s)Kador & Partner Part mbB
Corneliusstraße 15
80469 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1992/01]Kador & Partner
Corneliusstrasse 15
D-80469 München / DE
Application number, filing date91110198.820.06.1991
[1992/01]
Priority number, dateJP1990016472721.06.1990         Original published format: JP 16472790
[1992/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0463578
Date:02.01.1992
Language:EN
[1992/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0463578
Date:21.12.1994
Language:EN
[1994/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.10.1991
ClassificationIPC:C23C4/12
[1992/01]
CPC:
C23C4/123 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1992/01]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von spritzplattiertem Metallband[1992/01]
English:Process for producing spray plated metal strip[1992/01]
French:Procédé pour la production de bandes métalliques plaquées par pulvérisation[1992/01]
Examination procedure27.02.1992Examination requested  [1992/17]
19.07.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.11.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.02.1994Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
16.06.1994Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.08.1994Fee for grant paid
31.08.1994Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.09.1995No opposition filed within time limit [1995/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
29.06.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]FR2558850  ;
 [A]EP0119036  ;
 [A]US2873219
 [A]  - JOURNAL OF METAL vol. 41, no. 10, October 1989, WARRENDALE, USA pages 23 - 28; P. MATHUR ET AL: 'PROCESS CONTROL, MODELING AND APPLICATIONS OF SPRAY CASTING '
 [A]  - METTALLURGICAL TRANSACTIONS /A vol. 20A, no. 1, January 1989, WARRENDALE, USA pages 71 - 85; E. GUTIERREZ-MIRAVETE: 'A MATHEMATICAL MODEL OF THE SPRAY DEPOSITION PROCESS '
ExaminationJP1201456
    - Patent Abstracts of Japan, vol.13, no.504; (13.11.89); C-653, (&JP-A-1-201456), & JP1201456 A 00000000
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.