EP0465892 - Method for sealing a side conduit leading into a main pipe and device for carryinf out this method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.03.1994 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.1994 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.05.1994 [1994/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HERMANN HEMSCHEIDT MASCHINENFABRIK GMBH & CO. Bornberg 97-103 Postfach 100269 D-42002 Wuppertal / DE | [1992/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Behnert, Holger Schwartnerstrasse 1c W-5600 Wuppertal 2 / DE | 02 /
Heinz, Norbert, Dipl.-Ing. Königstrasse 118 W-5630 Remscheid / DE | [1992/03] | Application number, filing date | 91110217.6 | 21.06.1991 | [1992/03] | Priority number, date | DE19904022103 | 11.07.1990 Original published format: DE 4022103 | [1992/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0465892 | Date: | 15.01.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F16L55/16 | [1992/03] | CPC: |
F16L55/179 (EP);
F16L55/265 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/03] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Abdichten einer in eine Kanalrohrleitung einmündenden Zulaufleitung und Vorrichtung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens | [1992/03] | English: | Method for sealing a side conduit leading into a main pipe and device for carryinf out this method | [1992/03] | French: | Méthode pour l'étanchéification d'un tuyau de branchement raccordé avec un tuyau d'égout et dispositif pour mise en oeuvre | [1992/03] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 18.03.1992 | Examination requested [1992/21] | 04.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.08.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.1994 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1994/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0253588 ; | [A]WO8605569 ; | [AD]EP0335223 ; | [A]GB2147966 ; | [A]EP0310679 |