EP0470350 - Multi-spindle machine for drilling, milling or similar works [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.01.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.01.1996 [1996/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ATG ELECTRONIC GmbH Zum Schlag 3 97877 Wertheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/37] | For all designated states ATG ELECTRONIC GmbH Zum Schlag 3 D-97877 Wertheim / DE | ||
Former [1992/07] | For all designated states ADAPTRONIC AG Bodenackerstrasse 69 CH-4657 Dulliken / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Prokopp, Manfred Am Felder 27 W-6980 Wertheim-Reicholzheim / DE | [1992/07] | Representative(s) | Grosse, Rainer, et al Gleiss Grosse Schrell und Partner mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Leitzstrasse 45 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/07] | Grosse, Rainer, Dipl.-Ing., et al Gleiss & Grosse Patentanwaltskanzlei, Maybachstrasse 6A D-70469 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 91110298.6 | 22.06.1991 | [1992/07] | Priority number, date | DE19904025007 | 07.08.1990 Original published format: DE 4025007 | DE19904033520 | 22.10.1990 Original published format: DE 4033520 | [1992/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0470350 | Date: | 12.02.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0470350 | Date: | 01.07.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B23B39/16, B23C1/08 | [1992/07] | CPC: |
B23C1/08 (EP,US);
B23B39/161 (EP,US);
Y10T408/08 (EP,US);
Y10T408/21 (EP,US);
Y10T408/3806 (EP,US);
Y10T408/3833 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1992/07] | Title | German: | Mehrspindelmaschine zum Bohren, Fräsen oder dergleichen | [1992/07] | English: | Multi-spindle machine for drilling, milling or similar works | [1992/07] | French: | Machine multibroche pour percer, fraiser ou travaux similaires | [1992/07] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 16.12.1992 | Examination requested [1993/08] | 29.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.04.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/04] | 30.08.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1995 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP59196104 ; | [A]JP58082612 ; | [A]DE880836 (VOEST AG); | [A]DE1915659 (MASCHF AUGSBURG NUERNBERG AG); | [X]US3822958 (LEWIS J); | [A]FR2286683 (PHILIPS NV [NL]); | [A]DE2704415 (SCHEER & CIE C F); | [X]GB2196276 (MCGREGOR); | [A]EP0318965 (GRIESHABER MASCH [DE]) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 9, no. 63 (M-365)(1786) 20. März 1985 & JP-A-59 196 104 ( SUZUKI JIDOSHA KOGYO K.K. ) 7. November 1984, & JP59196104 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 7, no. 179 (M-234)(1324) 9. August 1983 & JP-A-58 082 612 ( HITACHI SEISAKUSHO K.K. ) 18. Mai 1983, & JP58082612 A 00000000 |