Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Event history: EP0463596


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
09.06.1995 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  02.08.1995 [1995/31]
20.09.1994 First examination report
09.07.1992 Request for examination filed published on  26.08.1992 [1992/35]
15.11.1991 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  02.01.1992 [1992/01]