blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0463596

EP0463596 - Cerebral function enhancing pyrimidinyl derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.06.1995
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip09.06.1995Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.08.1995 [1995/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
Route 206 and Province Line Road
Princeton, NJ 08543 / US
[N/P]
Former [1992/01]For all designated states
Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
345 Park Avenue
New York, N.Y. 10154 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Mattson, Ronald J.
65 Smithfield Avenue
Meriden, CT 06450 / US
02 / Mayol, Robert
56 Green Lane
Durham, CT 06244 / US
03 / Brady, Michael E.
3218 Far Reach Drive
Baldwinsville, NY 13027 / US
[1992/01]
Representative(s)Kinzebach, Werner, et al
Reitstötter, Kinzebach & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 86 06 49
81633 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1992/01]Kinzebach, Werner, Dr., et al
Patentanwälte Reitstötter, Kinzebach und Partner Postfach 86 06 49
D-81633 München / DE
Application number, filing date91110373.724.06.1991
[1992/01]
Priority number, dateUS1990054457027.06.1990         Original published format: US 544570
[1992/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0463596
Date:02.01.1992
Language:EN
[1992/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.09.1991
ClassificationIPC:C07D401/14, A61K31/505
[1992/01]
CPC:
C07D401/14 (EP,KR,US); A61P25/28 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1992/01]
TitleGerman:Cerebrale Funktion verbessernde Pyrimidinylderivate[1992/01]
English:Cerebral function enhancing pyrimidinyl derivatives[1992/01]
French:Dérivés pyrimidinyliques activant la fonction cérébrale[1992/01]
File destroyed:03.03.2001
Examination procedure30.06.1992Examination requested  [1992/35]
22.09.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.02.1995Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1995/31]
07.03.1995Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [1995/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.06.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
11.06.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[AP]US4524206  (NEW JAMES S [US], et al);
 [A]FR2584408  (BRISTOL MYERS CO [US]);
 [AP]US4963678  (MADDING GARY D [US], et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.