EP0468216 - Device to compensate for the inclination of the bodywork of a motor car [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.07.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.08.1994 [1994/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/09] | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft Postfach D-38436 Wolfsburg / DE | ||
Former [1992/05] | For all designated states Volkswagen AG D-3180 Wolfsburg 1 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Poschmann, Michael Lerchenweg 9 W-3306 Lehre / DE | [1992/05] | Application number, filing date | 91110583.1 | 26.06.1991 | [1992/05] | Priority number, date | DE19904023065 | 20.07.1990 Original published format: DE 4023065 | [1992/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0468216 | Date: | 29.01.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0468216 | Date: | 08.09.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B60G17/04, B60G17/08 | [1992/05] | CPC: |
B60G17/04 (EP);
B60G17/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1992/05] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Neigungskompensation des Aufbaus von Kraftfahrzeugen | [1993/17] | English: | Device to compensate for the inclination of the bodywork of a motor car | [1992/05] | French: | Dispositif pour compenser l'inclinaison de la caisse d'un véhicule automobile | [1992/05] |
Former [1992/05] | Vorrichtung zum Neigungskompensation des Aufbaus von Kraftfahrzeugen | Examination procedure | 13.12.1991 | Examination requested [1992/07] | 07.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.12.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP60050008 ; | [A]EP0373327 (PORSCHE AG [DE]); | [A]DE3814568 (STABILUS GMBH [DE]); | [A]EP0190944 (LOTUS GROUP PLC [GB]); | [A]GB2199618 (GEN MOTORS CORP); | [A]DE1261409 (BOGE GMBH); | [APD]EP0424784 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 9, no. 183 (M-400)(1906) 30. Juli 1985 & JP-A-60 050 008 ( KAYABA KOGYO ) 19. März 1985, & JP60050008 A 00000000 |