EP0465933 - Common emitter amplifier operating from a multiplicity of power supplies [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NATIONAL SEMICONDUCTOR CORPORATION 2900 Semiconductor Drive P.O. Box 58090 Santa Clara California 95051-8090 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/40] | For all designated states NATIONAL SEMICONDUCTOR CORPORATION 2900 Semiconductor Drive P.O. Box 58090 Santa Clara California 95051-8090 / US | ||
Former [1992/03] | For all designated states NATIONAL SEMICONDUCTOR CORPORATION 1090 Kifer Road, M/S 16-135 Sunnyvale, CA 95086-3737 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wright, Michael E. 1518 Martin Luther King Junior Way Berkeley, CA 94709 / US | [1992/03] | Representative(s) | Sparing Röhl Henseler Postfach 14 04 43 40074 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/03] | Sparing Röhl Henseler Patentanwälte Postfach 14 04 43 D-40074 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 91110609.4 | 26.06.1991 | [1992/03] | Priority number, date | US19900551427 | 10.07.1990 Original published format: US 551427 | [1992/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0465933 | Date: | 15.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0465933 | Date: | 02.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0465933 | Date: | 22.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H02J9/06, G05F3/26, G05F3/22, G05F1/56 | [1992/36] | CPC: |
G05F1/56 (EP,US);
H03F3/00 (KR);
G05F3/265 (EP,US);
H03F3/3066 (EP,US);
H03F3/343 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/03] | G05F3/26 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/03] | Title | German: | Emitterschaltungsverstärker von einer Multiplizität von Stromversorgungen betrieben | [1992/03] | English: | Common emitter amplifier operating from a multiplicity of power supplies | [1992/03] | French: | Amplificateur à émetteur commun commandé par une multiplicité de sources d'alimentation | [1992/03] | Examination procedure | 06.01.1993 | Examination requested [1993/10] | 03.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.11.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 22.05.1996 | IT | 22.05.1996 | GB | 22.08.1996 | [2004/35] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 22.05.1996 | |
GB | 22.08.1996 | ||
FR | 18.10.1996 | ||
Former [1997/30] | GB | 22.08.1996 | |
FR | 18.10.1996 | ||
Former [1997/17] | FR | 18.10.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP60000519 ; | [X]EP0162563 (HONEYWELL CONTROL SYST [GB]); | [A]US4812672 (COWAN MICHAEL L [US], et al); | [AD]US4779037 (LOCASCIO JAMES J [US]); | [A]US4638175 (BRADFORD MICHAEL P [US], et al); | [A]EP0321226 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]); | [A]US4591780 (YAMADA KAZUJI [JP], et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 9, no. 113 (P-356)(1836) 17 May 1985 & JP-A-60 000 519 ( NIPPON DENSHIN DENWA KOSHA ) 5 January 1985, & JP60000519 A 19850105 |