EP0464724 - Suspension system for automotive vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.10.1996 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.11.1996 [1996/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/02] | For all designated states Mazda Motor Corporation No. 3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takehara, Shin, c/o Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1 Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun, Hiroshima-ken / JP | 02 /
Morita, Toshiki, c/o Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1 Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun, Hiroshima-ken / JP | 03 /
Hamada, Kenji, c/o Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1 Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun, Hiroshima-ken / JP | [1992/02] | Representative(s) | Melzer, Wolfgang, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/19] | Melzer, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Mitscherlich & Partner, Postfach 33 06 09 D-80066 München / DE | ||
Former [1992/02] | Melzer, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Mitscherlich & Partner, Sonnenstrasse 33, Postfach 33 06 09 D-80066 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91110790.2 | 28.06.1991 | [1992/02] | Priority number, date | JP19900170643 | 28.06.1990 Original published format: JP 17064390 | [1992/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0464724 | Date: | 08.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0464724 | Date: | 16.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0464724 | Date: | 29.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B60G17/01 | [1992/02] | CPC: |
B60G17/0162 (EP,US);
B60G2202/154 (EP,US);
B60G2400/102 (EP,US);
B60G2400/104 (EP,US);
B60G2400/204 (EP,US);
B60G2400/206 (EP,US);
B60G2400/252 (EP,US);
B60G2400/412 (EP,US);
B60G2400/51 (EP,US);
B60G2400/5122 (EP,US);
B60G2500/30 (EP,US);
B60G2600/02 (EP,US);
B60G2600/26 (EP,US);
B60G2600/76 (EP,US);
B60G2800/012 (EP,US);
B60G2800/24 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/02] | Title | German: | Kraftfahrzeugaufhängungssystem | [1992/02] | English: | Suspension system for automotive vehicle | [1992/02] | French: | Système de suspension pour un véhicule automobile | [1992/02] | Examination procedure | 25.02.1993 | Examination requested [1993/17] | 19.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 30.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.05.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP63145114 ; | [Y]JP62234708 ; | [A]JP02095911 ; | [A]JP02060814 ; | [A]JP61081214 ; | [X]EP0358231 (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]); | [A]EP0234552 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0306004 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]FR2621866 (TOKICO LTD [JP]); | [A]GB2221878 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 400 (M-756)1988 & JP-A-63 145 114 ( MAZDA MOTOR CORP. ), & JP63145114 A 00000000 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 105 (M-681)1987 & JP-A-62 234 708 ( DAIHATSU MOTOR CO. ), & JP62234708 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 14, no. 300 (M-991)1990 & JP-A-02 095 911 ( FUJI HEAVY IND. ), & JP02095911 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 14, no. 231 (M-974)1990 & JP-A-02 060 814 ( NHK SPRING CO. ), & JP02060814 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 253 (M-512)1986 & JP-A-61 081 214 ( MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP. ), & JP61081214 A 00000000 |