EP0468242 - Method for the cleaning of textiles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 06.02.1998 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHEMISCHE FABRIK KREUSSLER & CO. GMBH Rheingaustrasse 87-93 D-65203 Wiesbaden / DE | [1992/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hasenclever, Kaspar D. Mittelheimer Strasse 7 W-6204 Taunusstein / DE | [1992/05] | Representative(s) | Weber, Dieter, et al Weber, Seiffert, Lieke Postfach 61 45 65051 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/28] | Weber, Dieter, Dr., et al Weber, Dieter, Dr., Seiffert, Klaus, Dipl.-Phys., Lieke, Winfried, Dr. Postfach 61 45 D-65051 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [1992/05] | Weber, Dieter, Dr. Weber, Dieter, Dr., Seiffert, Klaus, Dipl.-Phys., Lieke, Winfried, Dr. Postfach 61 45 D-65051 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 91111096.3 | 04.07.1991 | [1992/05] | Priority number, date | DE19904023053 | 20.07.1990 Original published format: DE 4023053 | [1992/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0468242 | Date: | 29.01.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0468242 | Date: | 10.05.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | D06F35/00 | [1992/05] | CPC: |
D06F35/006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1992/05] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Reinigung von Textilien | [1992/05] | English: | Method for the cleaning of textiles | [1992/05] | French: | Procédé pour le nettoyage de textiles | [1992/05] | Examination procedure | 11.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/15] | 15.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.10.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 29.11.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
08.02.1996
22.02.1996
ADMISSIBLE UNILEVER N.V. / UNILEVER PLC Weena 455/Unilever House, Blackfriars 3013 AL Rotterdam/London EC4P 4BQ / NL Opponent's representative Land, Addick Adrianus Gosling Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.02.1996
22.02.1996
ADMISSIBLE UNILEVER N.V. / UNILEVER PLC Weena 455/Unilever House, Blackfriars 3013 AL Rotterdam/London EC4P 4BQ / NL Opponent's representative Land, Addick Adrianus Gosling Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [1996/15] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.02.1996
22.02.1996
ADMISSIBLE UNILEVER N.V. / UNILEVER PLC P.O. Box 760 / Unilever House, Blackfriars NL-3000 DK ROTTERDAM / LONDON EC4 4BQ, GB / NL Opponent's representative Land, Addick Adrianus Gosling Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | 18.03.1996 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 26.04.1996 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 21.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.1997 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 24.10.1997 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 03.11.1997 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [1998/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1993 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.09.1993 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1284979 (PFENNINGSBERG GMBH MASCHFAB); | [A]DE1610132 (SIEMENS ELEKTROGERAETE GMBH); | [AD]EP0241567 (WFK TESTGEWEBE GMBH [DE]); | [X]EP0279483 (BAUKNECHT HAUSGERAETE [DE], et al); | [XP]EP0390943 (PROIZV OB PROZHEKTOR [SU], et al) |