EP0472859 - Solid state imaging device and method of driving the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.09.1996 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.11.1996 [1996/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku, Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/14] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72 Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku, Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | ||
Former [1995/01] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1992/10] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamada, Tetsuo 4-10-18, Hongodai, Sakae-Ku Yokohama-Shi, Kanagawa-Ken / JP | [1992/10] | Representative(s) | Lehn, Werner, et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/10] | Lehn, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91111115.1 | 04.07.1991 | [1992/10] | Priority number, date | JP19900176612 | 04.07.1990 Original published format: JP 17661290 | [1992/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0472859 | Date: | 04.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0472859 | Date: | 15.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H04N3/15 | [1992/10] | CPC: |
H01L27/14831 (EP,KR,US);
H01L27/14806 (KR);
H04N25/713 (EP,US);
H01G9/20 (KR);
H04N25/715 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/10] | Title | German: | Festkörper-Bildaufnahmeanordnung und Steuerverfahren dafür | [1992/10] | English: | Solid state imaging device and method of driving the same | [1992/10] | French: | Dispositif de prise d'image à l'état solide et son procédé de commande | [1992/10] | Examination procedure | 04.07.1991 | Examination requested [1992/10] | 11.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.05.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP60163464 ; | [Y]EP0262665 (NEC CORP [JP]); | [YD]EP0315778 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]); | [X]EP0329189 (VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN [JP]) |