EP0466044 - Method for obtaining inorganic micro-structures from Langmuir-Blodgett layers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.06.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.1992 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.07.1992 [1992/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/03] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Möhwald, Helmuth, Prof. Dr. Dr. Gebauer-Strasse 21 W-6530 Bingen / DE | 02 /
Tippmann-Krayer, Petra Zum Stefflacker 3 W-8000 München / DE | 03 /
Meisel, Werner Im Quellborn 17 W-6501 Kleinwinternheim / DE | 04 /
Höhne, Ulrike Pommernstrasse 2 W-6550 Bad Kreuznach / DE | [1992/03] | Application number, filing date | 91111208.4 | 05.07.1991 | [1992/03] | Priority number, date | DE19904021733 | 07.07.1990 Original published format: DE 4021733 | [1992/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0466044 | Date: | 15.01.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B05D1/20 | [1992/03] | CPC: |
B82Y30/00 (EP);
B05D1/208 (EP);
B82Y40/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, FR, GB, GR, IT, NL, SE [1992/03] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung anorganischer Mikrostrukturen aus Langmuir-Blodgett-Schichten | [1992/03] | English: | Method for obtaining inorganic micro-structures from Langmuir-Blodgett layers | [1992/03] | French: | Procédé pour préparer des microstructures inorganiques à partir de couches Langmuir-Blodgett | [1992/03] | File destroyed: | 17.02.2000 | Examination procedure | 04.06.1992 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1992/31] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3936279 ; | [A]US4317043 ; | [A]EP0359101 | [X] - DATABASE WPIL, no. 90-189 605,DERWENT PUBLICATIONS LTD, LondonGB | [X] - DATABASE WPIL, no. 90-175 224,DERWENT PUBLICATIONS LTD, LondonGB |