EP0471964 - Wash basin made of ceramic material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.05.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.1993 | Withdrawal of application | published on 30.06.1993 [1993/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DURAVIT AG Werderstrasse 36 78132 Hornberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/09] | For all designated states DURAVIT AG Werderstrasse 36 W-7746 Hornberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schwarze, Jan, Dipl.-Ing. Hirschenau 10 W-8501 Rückersdorf / DE | 02 /
Graf von der Groeben, Albrecht Franz Schiele Strasse 17 W-7746 Hornberg / DE | [1992/09] | Representative(s) | Matschkur, Lindner, Blaumeier Postfach 11 91 09 90101 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/09] | Matschkur, Götz, Lindner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 11 91 09 D-90101 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 91111261.3 | 06.07.1991 | [1992/09] | Priority number, date | DE19900011981U | 18.08.1990 Original published format: DE 9011981 U | [1992/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0471964 | Date: | 26.02.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0471964 | Date: | 03.06.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A47K1/04, E03C1/33 | [1992/09] | CPC: |
A47K1/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/09] | Title | German: | Waschtisch aus keramischem Werkstoff | [1992/09] | English: | Wash basin made of ceramic material | [1992/09] | French: | Lavabo en matériau céramique | [1992/09] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 10.07.1992 | Examination requested [1992/37] | 30.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.04.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/26] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE8523326U ; | [X]DE3042215 |