Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH04226609 | Global Dossier | 17.08.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | DE4027288 | 29.08.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0472863 | Global Dossier | 02.09.1998 | B1 | EP0472863 | 04.03.1992 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE4027288 | 29.08.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE170371T | 15.09.1998 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE4027288 | 29.08.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE4027288 | 09.08.2001 | C2 | DE4027288 | 05.03.1992 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE4027288 | 29.08.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59109044D1 | 08.10.1998 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE4027288 | 29.08.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2121759T | 16.12.1998 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE4027288 | 29.08.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2075304 | 20.03.1997 | C1 | Priority number | Date | DE4027288 | 29.08.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | UA42796 | 15.11.2001 | C2 | Priority number | Date | DE4027288 | 29.08.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5344218 | 06.09.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | DE4027288 | 29.08.1990 |