EP0466160 - Heat sink formulation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.03.1995 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.05.1995 [1995/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORTON COMPANY 1 New Bond Street, Box 15008 Worcester, MA 01615-0008 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/03] | For all designated states NORTON COMPANY 1 New Bond Street, Box 15008 Worcester, MA 01615-0008 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dolan, Michael J. 9664 Shenandoah Dr. Brecksville, OH 44141 / US | 02 /
Doddato, Carmine Michael 2459-24th Street Cuyahoga Falls, OH 44240 / US | 03 /
Butcher, Kenneth R. RT. 13 Box 342 Hendersonville, North Carolina 28739 / US | [1992/03] | Representative(s) | Diehl, Hermann O. Th., et al Diehl & Partner GbR Postfach 34 01 15 80098 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/03] | Diehl, Hermann O. Th., Dr., et al Diehl, Glaeser, Hiltl & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 19 03 65 D-80603 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91111574.9 | 11.07.1991 | [1992/03] | Priority number, date | US19900552676 | 11.07.1990 Original published format: US 552676 | [1992/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0466160 | Date: | 15.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C09K5/00, C04B33/13 | [1992/03] | CPC: |
C09K5/14 (EP);
C04B33/13 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1992/03] | Title | German: | Zusammensetzung für Wärmeschacht | [1992/03] | English: | Heat sink formulation | [1992/03] | French: | Composition pour puits à chaleur | [1992/03] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 24.01.1992 | Examination requested [1992/13] | 18.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 28.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 15.11.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/20] | 16.12.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1994 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP750142620 ; | [X]US4507218 ; | [X]GB2137978 ; | [A]US4299632 | [A] - Derwent file Supplier WPIL, Derwent Publications Ltd.,London GB AN 77-49369Y (28) &JP-A-750142620 (ISOLITE),31-05-75., & JP750142620 A 00000000 |