EP0468299 - Circuit arrangement with a transformer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.1996 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.08.1996 [1996/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AEG Sachsenwerk GmbH Einhauser Strasse 9 D-93053 Regensburg / DE | [1992/26] |
Former [1992/05] | For all designated states Sachsenwerk Aktiengesellschaft Rathenaustrasse 2 W-8400 Regensburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stegmüller, Karl, Dipl.-Ing. Galgenberg West 11 W-8401 Wiesent / DE | [1992/05] | Representative(s) | Breiter, Achim EHG Elektroholding GmbH Patente Theodor-Stern-Kai 1 60596 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/05] | Breiter, Achim, Dipl.-Ing. AEG Aktiengesellschaft Patent- und Lizenzwesen Theodor-Stern-Kai 1 D-60591 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 91111590.5 | 12.07.1991 | [1992/05] | Priority number, date | DE19904023238 | 21.07.1990 Original published format: DE 4023238 | [1992/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0468299 | Date: | 29.01.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0468299 | Date: | 19.11.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0468299 | Date: | 06.09.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H02H3/02, H02H7/04, H01H85/46 | [1992/05] | CPC: |
H02H7/04 (EP);
H01H85/46 (EP);
H02H3/021 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/05] | Title | German: | Schaltungsanordnung mit einem Transformator | [1992/05] | English: | Circuit arrangement with a transformer | [1992/05] | French: | Circuit avec un transformateur | [1992/05] | Examination procedure | 29.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/25] | 13.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.03.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE868467 (SIEMENS AG); | [A]US2838718 (HAROLD EDMUNDS WILLIAM) | Examination | - G. G. SEIP "Electrical Installations Handbook", 2. Auflage, Teil 1, Kapitel 1.4; 1987, J. Wiley & Sons |