EP0467266 - Direct modulation phase shift keying (DM-PSK) transmission system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 28.11.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.1997 | Refusal of application | published on 14.01.1998 [1998/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/04] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Naito, Takao 488-301, Idasugiyama-cho, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa, 211 / JP | 02 /
Chikama, Terumi 1-19-5-A203-22, Ogawa Machida-shi, Tokyo, 194 / JP | 03 /
Watanabe, Shigeki 3-13-9-702, Inukura, Miyamae-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa, 216 / JP | 04 /
Kuwahara, Hideo 20-52-104, Nanpeidai, Miyamae-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa, 216 / JP | [1992/04] | Representative(s) | Lehn, Werner, et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/04] | Lehn, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91111774.5 | 15.07.1991 | [1992/04] | Priority number, date | JP19900187998 | 18.07.1990 Original published format: JP 18799890 | [1992/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0467266 | Date: | 22.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0467266 | Date: | 09.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/20, H04L27/22, H04B10/14 | [1992/04] | CPC: |
H04L27/223 (EP,US);
H04B10/50 (EP,US);
H04B10/504 (EP,US);
H04B10/5561 (EP,US);
H04B10/60 (EP,US);
H04B10/64 (EP,US);
H04L27/2096 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/04] | Title | German: | Übertragungssystem mit Direktmodulationsphasenumtastung | [1992/04] | English: | Direct modulation phase shift keying (DM-PSK) transmission system | [1992/04] | French: | Système de transmission à modulation directe à déplacement de phase | [1992/04] | Examination procedure | 04.06.1993 | Examination requested [1993/31] | 18.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.06.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 19.08.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1998/03] | 29.08.1997 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1998/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1997 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0357799 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]); | [AP]EP0404054 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) | [A] - JOURNAL OF LIGHTWAVE TECHNOLOGY vol. 8, no. 3, March 1990, NEW YORK US pages 309 - 322 CHIKAMA ET AL. 'Modulation and demodulation techniques in optical heterodyne PSK transmission systems' | [A] - ELECTRONICS LETTERS vol. 24, no. 15, 21 July 1988, ENAGE GB pages 974 - 976 HABBAB ET AL. 'Phase - insensitive zero IF coherent optical system using phase switching' |