EP0467276 - Polymer scale preventive agent and method of preventing polymer scale deposition using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.01.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.02.2000 [2000/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/04] | For all designated states SHIN-ETSU CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 6-1, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Usuki, Masahiro Shin-Etsu Kagaku Yushi ryo, 3-3-24, Shittechuo Kamisu-machi, Kashima-gun, Ibaraki-ken / JP | 02 /
Kitamura, Hajime 6-14-2, Aobadai Ichihara-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | 03 /
Ueno, Susumo, Shin-Etsu Kagaku Shataku 3-308 3-9809-7, Doaihon-cho, Hazaki-machi Kashima-gun, Ibaraki-ken / JP | 04 /
Watanabe, Mikio, Shin-Etsu Kagaku Yushi ryo 203 3-3-24, Shittechuo, Kamisu-machi Kashima-gun, Ibaraki-ken / JP | 05 /
Yono, Masayoshi 3-5-15-1, Doaiminami, Hazaki-machi Kashima-gun, Ibaraki-ken / JP | [1992/04] | Representative(s) | von Füner, Alexander, et al v. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano Mariahilfplatz 2 & 3 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/04] | von Füner, Alexander, Dr., et al Patentanwälte v. Füner, Ebbinghaus, Finck Mariahilfplatz 2 & 3 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91111799.2 | 15.07.1991 | [1992/04] | Priority number, date | JP19900187529 | 16.07.1990 Original published format: JP 18752990 | JP19900240245 | 11.09.1990 Original published format: JP 24024590 | [1992/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0467276 | Date: | 22.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0467276 | Date: | 19.02.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0467276 | Date: | 28.02.1996 | [1996/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.12.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C08F2/00 | [1992/04] | CPC: |
C08F2/004 (EP,US);
C08F2/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, NL, SE [1992/04] | Title | German: | Mittel zur Verhinderung von Krustenbildung von Polymeren und Verfahren zur Verhinderung der Krustenbildung mittels diesen Mittels | [1992/04] | English: | Polymer scale preventive agent and method of preventing polymer scale deposition using the same | [1992/04] | French: | Agent pour empêcher la formation d'encroûtement de polymères, et procédé pour empêcher la formation d'encroûtement utilisant cet agent | [1992/04] | Examination procedure | 22.07.1992 | Examination requested [1992/38] | 21.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 24.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.08.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 28.02.1996 | [2000/05] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3019390 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO); | [A]EP0096319 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]); | [A]US4758639 (KOYANAGI SHUNICHI [JP], et al); | [A]GB1222595 (ILFORD LTD); | [A]DE2211240 (BERNARD FERRER) |