EP0467319 - Device for solid and gaseous wastes in the manufacture of mixtures out of pulverised solids and bonding agents with volatile parts or the like and use thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.03.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.05.1994 [1994/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Herberts Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung Christbusch 25 42285 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/04] | For all designated states Herberts Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung Christbusch 25 D-42285 Wuppertal / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Enge, Manfred Vonkeln 45 A W-5600 Wuppertal 12 / DE | 02 /
Gregor, Lothar Dasnöckel 83 W-5600 Wuppertal 11 / DE | [1992/04] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/04] | Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert Brucknerstrasse 20 D-40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 91111922.0 | 17.07.1991 | [1992/04] | Priority number, date | DE19900010726U | 18.07.1990 Original published format: DE 9010726 U | [1992/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0467319 | Date: | 22.01.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0467319 | Date: | 24.02.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B08B15/00, B01F15/00 | [1993/08] | CPC: |
B01J8/10 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1992/04] | B08B15/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1992/04] | Title | German: | Entsorgevorrichtung für feste und gasförmige Abfallstoffe beim Herstellen von Gemischen aus pulvrigen Feststoffen und Bindemitteln mit flüchtigen Anteilen oder dergleichen, und deren Verwendung | [1992/04] | English: | Device for solid and gaseous wastes in the manufacture of mixtures out of pulverised solids and bonding agents with volatile parts or the like and use thereof | [1992/04] | French: | Dispositif pour des déchets dans l'état solide ou gazeux dans la manufacture des mixtures de solides pulvérisés et de céments avec des parts volatiles ou comme ça, et son usage | [1992/04] | File destroyed: | 27.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 25.08.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/18] | 15.12.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1994/18] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 01.10.1993 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1993 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0054285 ; | [A]DE3826340 ; | [A]US4031819 ; | [A]DE8903066U ; | [A]FR2312306 ; | [A]FR2311600 |