EP0523266 - Integratable current mirror [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.09.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.10.1997 [1997/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/03] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Feldtkeller, Martin, Dipl.-Ing. Josephsburgstrasse 59 W-8000 München 80 / DE | 02 /
Simon, Marc Ramelet-Moundi F-31170 Tournefe ville / FR | [1993/03] | Application number, filing date | 91111958.4 | 17.07.1991 | [1993/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0523266 | Date: | 20.01.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0523266 | Date: | 06.11.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G05F3/26 | [1993/03] | CPC: |
G05F3/267 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1993/03] | Title | German: | Integrierbarer Stromspiegel | [1993/03] | English: | Integratable current mirror | [1993/03] | French: | Miroir à courant intégrable | [1993/03] | Examination procedure | 01.07.1993 | Examination requested [1993/35] | 08.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.05.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 19.07.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3611548 ; | [A]DE3913446 ; | [A]EP0403195 ; | [A]US4647841 |