EP0467348 - Acrylic copolymer rubber [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.03.1996 [1996/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOSOH CORPORATION 4560, Kaisei-cho Shinnanyo-shi Yamaguchi-ken, 746-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/04] | For all designated states Tosoh Corporation 4560, Kaisei-cho Shinnanyo-shi, Yamaguchi-ken, 746 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miyagawa, Yasumichi 10-43, Nijigaoka 2-chome Hikari-shi, Yamaguchi-ken / JP | 02 /
Kamezawa, Mitsuhiro 5-5, Mandokoro 4-chome Shinnanyo-shi, Yamaguchi-ken / JP | 03 /
Higashino, Toshiya 5-14, Chiyoda-cho Tokuyama-shi, Yamaguchi-ken / JP | 04 /
Yamamoto, Takashi 4-10, Ouchi-cho Tokuyama-shi, Yamaguchi-ken / JP | 05 /
Ozoe, Shinji 3-35, Miyanomae 2-chome Shinnanyo-shi, Yamaguchi-ken / JP | [1992/07] |
Former [1992/04] | 01 /
Miyagawa, Yasumichi 18-12, Asae 5-chome Hikari-shi, Yamaguchi-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Kamezawa, Mitsuhiro 5-5, Mandokoro 4-chome Shinnanyo-shi, Yamaguchi-ken / JP | |||
03 /
Higashino, Toshiya 5-14, Chiyoda-cho Tokuyama-shi, Yamaguchi-ken / JP | |||
04 /
Yamamoto, Takashi 4-10, Ouchi-cho Tokuyama-shi, Yamaguchi-ken / JP | |||
05 /
Ozoe, Shinji 3-35, Miyanomae 2-chome Shinnanyo-shi, Yamaguchi-ken / JP | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/04] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91111981.6 | 17.07.1991 | [1992/04] | Priority number, date | JP19900187878 | 18.07.1990 Original published format: JP 18787890 | JP19900301101 | 08.11.1990 Original published format: JP 30110190 | JP19910149315 | 27.05.1991 Original published format: JP 14931591 | [1992/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0467348 | Date: | 22.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0467348 | Date: | 29.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0467348 | Date: | 05.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C08F220/36, C08F220/18 | [1992/04] | CPC: |
C08F220/36 (EP,US);
C08F220/1802 (EP,US);
C08F220/1804 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/04] | Title | German: | Acrylat-Copolymer-Kautschuk | [1992/04] | English: | Acrylic copolymer rubber | [1992/04] | French: | Caoutchouc d'un copolymère acrylate | [1992/04] | Examination procedure | 01.04.1992 | Examination requested [1992/22] | 09.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 21.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 28.09.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0315969 (TOSOH CORP [JP]); | [A]GB746914 (MONSANTO CHEMICALS) |