EP0467394 - Graphic processor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.08.2000 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.08.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.10.2000 [2000/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/42] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | ||
Former [1992/04] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tachibana, Kazuhiko 3-7, Shiomidai, Isogo-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Kai, Naoyuki 3-2-3, Higashijujo Kita-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Nagashima, Ichiro 19-8, Umegaoka, Midor-shi Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1992/04] | Representative(s) | Lehn, Werner, et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/04] | Lehn, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91112126.7 | 19.07.1991 | [1992/04] | Priority number, date | JP19900190778 | 20.07.1990 Original published format: JP 19077890 | [1992/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0467394 | Date: | 22.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0467394 | Date: | 10.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0467394 | Date: | 20.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G06T15/10 | [1998/47] | CPC: |
G06T1/00 (KR);
G06T15/405 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1992/04] | G06F15/72 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/04] | Title | German: | Graphisches Verarbeitungsgerät | [1992/04] | English: | Graphic processor | [1992/04] | French: | Processeur graphique | [1992/04] | Examination procedure | 19.07.1991 | Examination requested [1992/04] | 30.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 16.01.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.04.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.07.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0307019 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LTD [GB], et al); | [Y]EP0167880 (IBM [US]) |