EP0468394 - Communication apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.09.1994 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.1994 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.11.1994 [1994/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DIEHL GMBH & CO. Stephanstrasse 49 90478 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/05] | For all designated states DIEHL GMBH & CO. Stephanstrasse 49 D-90478 Nürnberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Westphal, Robert, Dr. Oldenburgerstrasse 74 W-8500Nürnberg / DE | 02 /
Werner, Wolfgang Wilhelm-Spaeth-Strasse 70 W-8500 Nürnberg / DE | [1992/05] | Application number, filing date | 91112228.1 | 22.07.1991 | [1992/05] | Priority number, date | DE19904023890 | 27.07.1990 Original published format: DE 4023890 | DE19914102816 | 31.01.1991 Original published format: DE 4102816 | [1992/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0468394 | Date: | 29.01.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0468394 | Date: | 22.04.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G01S13/02, G01S13/82, G06K7/10 | [1992/17] | CPC: |
G01S13/825 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1992/05] | G01S13/82 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/05] | Title | German: | Kommunikationseinrichtung | [1992/05] | English: | Communication apparatus | [1992/05] | French: | Appareil de communication | [1992/05] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 09.04.1992 | Examination requested [1992/25] | 15.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.1994 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1994/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0324564 ; | [Y]EP0245555 ; | [Y]EP0273326 |