EP0467413 - Electric control apparatus for four-wheel steering system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.1995 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.09.1995 [1995/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/04] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tanaka, Hiroaki 84-2, 7-chome, Kosakahonmachi Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 02 /
Takeda, Osamu 1200, Mishuku Susono-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | 03 /
Ohashi, Kaoru 2-10-19, Midorigaoka Okazaki-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 04 /
Sugiyama, Mizuho 301-gou, Mezon do Serinu, 4-1, 2-chome Tsukimi-cho, Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 05 /
Koike, Shin 4-78-2, Kubo-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 06 /
Iwata, Hitoshi 9-54, Ogida, Hosokawa-cho Okazaki-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 07 /
Ishikawa, Masaru 1321, Mishuku Susono-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | 08 /
Kusunoki, Hideki 8-6-145, Oobayashi-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [1992/11] |
Former [1992/04] | 01 /
Tanaka, Hiroaki 84-2, 7-chome, Kosakahonmachi Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Takeda, Osamu 1200, Mishuku Susono-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | |||
03 /
Ohashi, Kaoru 2-10-19, Midorigaoka Okazaki-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | |||
04 /
Sugiyama, Mizuho 4-16, Miyukihonmachi Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | |||
05 /
Koike, Shin 4-78-2, Kubo-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | |||
06 /
Iwata, Hitoshi 9-54, Ogida, Hosokawa-cho Okazaki-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | |||
07 /
Ishikawa, Masaru 1321, Mishuku Susono-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | |||
08 /
Kusunoki, Hideki 8-6-145, Oobayashi-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | Representative(s) | Tiedtke, Harro, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/08] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1992/04] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91112275.2 | 22.07.1991 | [1992/04] | Priority number, date | JP19900193393 | 20.07.1990 Original published format: JP 19339390 | [1992/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0467413 | Date: | 22.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0467413 | Date: | 05.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B62D7/15 | [1992/04] | CPC: |
B62D7/1581 (EP,US);
B62D7/159 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/04] | Title | German: | Elektrische Regelvorrichtung für ein Vierrad-Lenksystem | [1992/04] | English: | Electric control apparatus for four-wheel steering system | [1992/04] | French: | Dispositif de contrôle électrique pour système de direction à quatre roues | [1992/04] | Examination procedure | 29.11.1991 | Examination requested [1992/04] | 04.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.04.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0316932 (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]); | [A]EP0280207 (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]); | [A]DE3814059 (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]); | [A]US4732231 (KANAZAWA HIROTAKA [JP], et al) |